FL S0528 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a voter from being challenged on the basis of certain documents. Prohibits certain persons from submitting a formal challenge to an individual's eligibility to register to vote or to vote in any election under certain circumstances.
Title
Voter Eligibility Challenge [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Ethics and Elections | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations -SJ 00043 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Policy & Steering Committee on Governmental Operations | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0681 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)