FL S0534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing each county to establish a supervised bond program with the concurrence of the chief judge of the judicial circuit, the county's chief correctional officer, the state attorney, and the public defender; authorizing the chief judge of each circuit, with the concurrence of the county's chief correctional officer, the state attorney, and the public defender, to enter an administrative order for the use of a risk assessment instrument in pretrial release determinations; providing that a court retains sole discretion to determine the appropriateness of pretrial release and any necessary pretrial release conditions, etc.
Title
Pretrial Release
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/11/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1334 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 595 (Ch. 2019-81), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
907 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
907 | 0421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/534 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/534/BillText/Filed/HTML |