FL S0536 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that any deferred presentment transaction entered into by a drawer with a nonexempt person who is not registered under specified provisions are void. Provides penalties and civil remedies. Provides that it is a felony of the third degree to collect on any deferred presentment transaction known to be void. Provides criminal penalties.
Title
Money Transmitters' Code [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00043 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Criminal Justice; Judiciary; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |