FL S0536 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Chapter No. 2014-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to conduct a study in coordination with the stakeholders on the expansion of the beneficial use of reclaimed water, stormwater, and excess surface water and to submit a report based upon such study; providing requirements for the report; requiring the department to provide the public an opportunity for input and for public comment, etc.
Title
Reclaimed Water
Sponsors
Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Senate Agriculture Committee | Sen. Wilton Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#800 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Chapter No. 2014-79 | |
2014-06-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2014-04-28 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-28 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 601 |
2014-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-25 | House | Received |
2014-04-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/14 |
2014-04-25 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2014-04-23 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-11 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (573812) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (651544) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/14 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/26/14 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | CS/CS by- Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/20/14, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Now in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/17/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/10/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2013-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0601 (Same As) 2014-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 536 (Ch. 2014-79)