FL S0542 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Chapter No. 2022-99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-11 - Chapter No. 2022-99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that specified actions taken by a business during certain declared emergencies may not be used as evidence in certain civil causes of action, etc.
Title
Evidentiary Standards for Actions Arising During an Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#686 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#686 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Chapter No. 2022-99 | |
2022-05-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-05-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (782315) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 2 |
2022-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Amendment 782315 adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | House | Substituted for HB 411 |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022) |
2022-02-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022) |
2022-02-17 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | In Messages |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 1 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/27/22 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/20/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-11-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 11/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H411 (Similar To) 2022-03-01 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 542