FL S0552 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "special private gain or loss"; prohibiting a member of the Legislature from voting upon or participating in any legislation inuring to the personal gain or loss of the member or his or her relative; prohibiting a member of the Legislature from participating in any legislation inuring to the personal gain or loss of a business associate, employer, board on which the member sits, principal by whom the member is retained, or parent corporation or subsidiary of such principal; requiring that members of the Legislature vote on the General Appropriations Act and disclose conflicts of interest with any line-item appropriation, etc.
Title
Ethics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Judiciary | |
2012-01-27 | Now in Judiciary -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-26 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/26/12, 3:45 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 48 | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules Subcommittee on Ethics and Elections; Rules; Budget -SJ 48 | |
2011-10-13 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/552 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0552/BillText/Filed/HTML |