FL S0554 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that each district school board provide disability history and awareness instruction in all K-12 public schools; requiring that the Department of Education assist in creating the curriculum for the disability history and awareness instruction; creating the Disability History and Awareness Advisory Council within the Department of Education; requiring that the department act as the fiscal agent for all financial transactions required by the council, etc.
Title
Disability Awareness
Sponsors
Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs Committee | Senate Education Pre-K - 12 Committee | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] | Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Now in Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations | |
2012-02-14 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 518 | |
2012-02-13 | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time -SJ 502 | |
2012-02-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-10 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-09 | CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 -SJ 500 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/09/12, 1:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/12, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-11 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 112 | |
2012-01-10 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 104 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 48 | |
2012-01-09 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-09 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 112 | |
2011-12-21 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/09/12, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget -SJ 48 | |
2011-10-14 | Filed |