FL S0554 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 591
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 591
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as "Ariya's Act"; designating the month of April as "Hot Car Death Prevention Month"; providing that certain agencies and local governments are encouraged to sponsor events for a specified purpose, etc.
Title
Hot Car Death Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-10 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 591 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 591 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/10/24, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2023-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2023-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H591 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Chapter No. 2024-66