FL S0556 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing a woman breastfeeding her child to be excused from jury service for a specified period following the child's birth; providing for additional excused periods, etc.
Title
Persons Excused from Jury Service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0335 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/556 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0556/BillText/Filed/HTML |