FL S0556 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a person is disqualified from receiving compensation under the Victims of Wrongful Incarceration Compensation Act if, before or during the person's wrongful conviction and incarceration, the person was convicted of, or pled guilty or nolo contendere to, any violent felony; specifying that a wrongfully incarcerated person who is released from wrongful incarceration to parole or community supervision and who commits a violent felony, rather than a felony law violation, resulting in revocation of the parole or community supervision is ineligible for compensation, etc.
Title
Compensation of Victims of Wrongful Incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0393 (Same As) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 494 (Ch. 2017-120)
S0494 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-120
S0494 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Chapter No. 2017-120
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
961 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
961 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/556 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/0556/BillText/Filed/HTML |