FL S0556 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Emergency Medical Air Transportation Act"; directing the Department of Health to establish the Emergency Medical Air Transportation Act Account within the Emergency Medical Services Trust Fund; providing conditions for the department to increase Florida Medicaid reimbursement payments to emergency medical air transportation services providers, etc.
Title
Emergency Medical Air Transportation Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H943 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 2515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/556 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/556/BillText/Filed/HTML |