FL S0576 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes an obsolete deadline for the Department of Environmental Protection to adopt rules regarding water quality credit trading among the pollutant sources to a water body or water body segment.
Title
Environmental Control [EPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; General Government Appropriations; Rules -SJ 00045 | |
2009-12-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; General Government Appropriations; Rules | |
2009-10-27 | Filed |