FL S0578 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 837
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 837
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the use of certain funds from the Florida Hurricane Catastrophe Fund to also include construction of certain facilities; revising provisions to require the Manufactured Housing and Mobile Home Mitigation and Enhancement Program to be operated by Gulf Coast State College; delaying the future repeal of the Hurricane Loss Mitigation Program, etc.
Title
Hurricane Loss Mitigation Program
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 837 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 837 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/02/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H837 (Same As) 2022-05-26 - Chapter No. 2022-137
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003
H5003 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-157
S2502 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5003