FL S0590 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 225 (Ch. 2015-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 225 (Ch. 2015-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "All-American Flag Act"; requiring a United States flag or a state flag that is purchased on or after a specified date by the state, a county, or a municipality for public use to be made in the United States, etc.
Title
Flags
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Sen. Rob Bradley [R] | Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 225 (Ch. 2015-138) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Substituted HB 225 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0225 (Same As) 2015-06-15 - Chapter No. 2015-138
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/590 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0590/BillText/Filed/HTML |