FL S0590 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising parent, guardian, or caregiver notification requirements that must be met before an involuntary examination of a minor; requiring a principal or his or her designee who successfully notifies any known emergency contact to share only the information necessary to alert such contact that the parent or caregiver must be contacted; requiring codes of student conduct to include provisions relating to civil citation or similar prearrest diversion programs for specified purposes; revising training requirements for school safety officers, etc.
Title
School Safety
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#327 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Chapter No. 2021-176 | |
2021-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-28 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-27 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-27 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/26/2021) |
2021-04-23 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-22 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (227004, 603772, 693672) 586, 587 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-19 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 03/30/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Now in Education |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/16/21, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Education; Appropriations |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H383 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 590 (Ch. 2021-176)
H7035 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 590 (Ch. 2021-176)
H7035 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 590 (Ch. 2021-176)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 212 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1006 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |