FL S0616 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that certain applicants not be licensed in any state or territory in order to be licensed by endorsement; providing license renewal requirements for nonresident licensees; requiring that a majority of the hours required for continuing education include specific content, etc.
Title
Public Accountancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#364 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#364 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#38 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Chapter No. 2021-98 | |
2021-06-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2021-04-28 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (438629) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2021-04-28 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 1 |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Amendment 438629 adopted |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Amendment 438629 filed |
2021-04-26 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021) |
2021-04-26 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-21 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-20 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/16/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/15/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/01/21, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H317 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 616 (Ch. 2021-98)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
473 | 308 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
473 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
473 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |