FL S0618 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Substituted HB 7093 -SJ 00662; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7093 (Ch. 2010-74) -SJ 00662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Substituted HB 7093 -SJ 00662; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7093 (Ch. 2010-74) -SJ 00662
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals a specified provision relating to an exemption from the public records and public meetings requirements for those portions of meetings of the Domestic Security Oversight Council, including records thereof, at which active criminal investigative or intelligence information is discussed. Saves the exemption from repeal under the OGSR Act. Deletes provisions providing for repeal of the exemption.
Title
OGSR/Domestic Security Oversight Council [GPSC]
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00662; Substituted HB 7093 -SJ 00662; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7093 (Ch. 2010-74) -SJ 00662 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00594 | |
2010-04-08 | Withdrawn from Rules -SJ 00523; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-03-03 | Now in Rules -SJ 00183 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules -SJ 00047; On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 01/20/10, 10:00 am, 37-S; Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00163; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 110-S; Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00183 | |
2010-02-25 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 110-S | |
2010-01-21 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-01-20 | Favorable by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | |
2010-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs and Domestic Security, 01/20/10, 10:00 am, 37-S | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | |
2009-11-05 | SPB 7000 submitted as a committee bill (SB 618) by Military Affairs and Domestic Security; Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7093 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-74