FL S0618 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as "Dexter's Law"; creating an animal abuse registry within the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the clerk of court in the judicial circuit in which a person's conviction for an animal abuse offense occurred to forward a copy of the judgment document of the conviction and other specified information to the department within a specified timeframe after the date of judgment; requiring that each person registered with the animal abuse registry update his or her registration information each time he or she moves from one residential address to another or, if his or her residential address does not change, annually following the date of his or her first registration; requiring that each person on the registry pay an annual administrative fee to the department; providing that a person who fails to register with the department, fails to update critical information, or fails to pay the annual administrative fee, commits a misdemeanor of the first degree, etc.
Title
Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Agriculture | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -SJ 53 | |
2011-11-02 | Referred to Agriculture; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 53 | |
2011-10-20 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/618 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/0618/BillText/Filed/HTML |