FL S0618 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for accessibility for disabled persons at gasoline stations; requiring the gasoline station to have a telephone number that is operational and answered by an attendant during the hours the gasoline station is open; requiring certain signage at each self-service gasoline pump; providing for size and content of the signs; requiring an attendant to provide refueling assistance to a person with a permit or license plate issued under specified provisions, etc.
Title
Gasoline Stations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2013-03-19 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/18/13, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Transportation; Rules |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0503 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
H0469 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
S0902 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
H0469 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
S0902 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government