FL S0618 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging local communities and public or private educational institutions to implement prearrest diversion programs for certain offenders; authorizing law enforcement officers of participating law enforcement agencies, at their sole discretion, to issue civil citations to adults under specified circumstances; providing for criminal prosecution of adults who fail to complete the prearrest diversion program, etc.
Title
Prearrest Diversion Programs
Sponsors
Senate Fiscal Policy Committee | Senate Community Affairs Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Greg Evers [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Messages |
2016-02-18 | House | In Messages |
2016-02-11 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (108126) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/02/16 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-01-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-11-17 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 11/17/15, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Community Affairs; Fiscal Policy |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1031 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee