FL S0626 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Read 2nd time -SJ 516, 522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Read 2nd time -SJ 516, 522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies provisions relating to references to the corporation known as Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc. Clarifies provisions regarding the purpose of the corporation. Authorizes the corporation to create corporate subsidiaries and affiliates. Provides that Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc., Shands Jacksonville Medical Center, Inc., Shands Jacksonville Healthcare, Inc., and any not-for-profit subsidiary of such entities are instrumentalities of the state for purposes of sovereign immunity.
Title
Shands Teaching Hospital and Clinics, Inc.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Dean [R] | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] | Sen. Steve Oelrich [R] | Sen. Eleanor Sobel [D] |
Sen. John Thrasher [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Read 2nd time -SJ 516, 522 | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/11 | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-29 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable by Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 269 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 03/22/11, 8:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-15 | Now in Higher Education -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable by Health Regulation; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 226 | |
2011-03-09 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/14/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 52 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 52 | |
2011-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/626 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0626/BillText/Filed/HTML |