FL S0626 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1221 (Ch. 2023-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1221 (Ch. 2023-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that the poles of rural electric cooperatives that are engaged in the provision of broadband are subject to regulation by the Public Service Commission; authorizing the commission to access the books and records of such cooperatives for specified purposes; providing that such information that contains proprietary confidential business information retains its confidential or exempt status when held by the commission; authorizing rural electric cooperatives to engage in the provision of broadband, etc.
Title
Broadband Internet Service Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1221 (Ch. 2023-199) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1221 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/05/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1221 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - Chapter No. 2023-199
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
364 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
425 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |