FL S0632 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the state and its political subdivisions to give preference in promotion in positions of employment to certain veterans or their relatives; requiring the Department of Veterans' Affairs to adopt certain rules to ensure veterans are given special consideration in the promotion process; requiring a numerically based selection process to be used to determine qualifications for promotion; providing for an investigation and administrative hearing of a complaint regarding not being awarded a promotion according to veterans' promotion preference, etc.
Title
Veterans' Preference in Promotion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H687 (Same As) 2023-05-05 - Died in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
295 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/632 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/632/BillText/Filed/HTML |