FL S0658 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the licensure of locksmith services businesses and locksmith referral services by the DOACS. Requires fingerprinting and background screening for criminal records checks of the owner and certain other persons affiliated with a locksmith services business. Requires the FDLE to provide certain records to the DOACS upon request. Provides that a violation of the act is a deceptive and unfair trade practice, etc.
Title
Locksmith Services [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Governmental Oversight and Accountability | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00523; Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00523 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/07/10, 8:00 am, 412-K | |
2010-03-22 | Now in Community Affairs -SJ 00279 | |
2010-03-18 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-17 | CS by Commerce; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 00278; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00282 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00050 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Commerce; Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-11-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0301 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0559 | 941 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 942 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 943 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 944 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 945 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 946 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 947 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 948 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 949 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 952 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 953 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 954 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 955 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 956 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 957 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 958 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 959 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 96 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 961 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0559 | 962 | New Code | See Bill Text |