FL S0658 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 623 (Ch. 2013-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 623 (Ch. 2013-199)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exception to the maximum allowable capacity for individual containers of wine sold in this state; providing that, except as provided in s. 564.09, F.S., all wine containers sold or offered for sale at retail for consumption off the premises shall be in the original container, etc.
Title
Wine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 623 (Ch. 2013-199) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 623 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/13 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/16/13 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/13, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/02/13, 8:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2013-03-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/18/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/07/13, 10:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0623 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-199