FL S0672 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing historical monuments to be erected and maintained; requiring express legislative approval for such historical monuments, etc.
Title
Sites of Historic Interest and Value Within the State Park System
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0493 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/672 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0672/BillText/Filed/HTML |