FL S0678 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a residential rental agreement to specify whether renters insurance is required; providing that failure to include a certain notice in a rental agreement does not create a private cause of action or nullify any part of the rental agreement, etc.
Title
Renters Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/05/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2017-10-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H467 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/678 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/678/BillText/Filed/HTML |