FL S0708 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 566 (Ch. 2021-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 566 (Ch. 2021-175)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying motor vehicle insurance requirements for peer-to-peer car-sharing programs; authorizing peer-to-peer car-sharing programs to own and maintain certain policies of motor vehicle insurance; requiring peer-to-peer car-sharing programs to assume certain liability; authorizing motor vehicle insurance policies to exclude specified coverages under certain circumstances; authorizing specified insurers to seek contributions against indemnifications under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Peer-to-peer Car Sharing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 566 (Ch. 2021-175) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Transportation; Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H365 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 566 (Ch. 2021-175)
S566 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-175
H785 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
S566 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-175
H785 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/708 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/708/BillText/Filed/HTML |