FL S0712 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 1 NAYS 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 1 NAYS 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prescribing the annual salaries for members of the Legislature; providing for future adjustment of salaries, etc.
Title
Compensation of Members of the Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | Unfavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability, laid on Table; YEAS 1 NAYS 3 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/16/16, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/712 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/0712/BillText/Filed/HTML |