FL S0712 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying distribution requirements for certain safe schools allocation funds for the 2019-2020 fiscal year; requiring each district school superintendent to remit specified unused funds from the 2018-2019 fiscal year to the Department of Education; authorizing the department to redistribute such funds to certain school districts for a specific purpose, etc.
Title
School Safety Funding
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Education; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H655 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/712 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/712/BillText/Filed/HTML |