FL S0718 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2017-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2017-28)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising a reduction of vessel registration fees for recreational vessels equipped with certain position indicating and locating beacons, etc.
Title
Vessel Registrations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 711 (Ch. 2017-28) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 711 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/06/17, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 03/21/17, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/14/17, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0711 (Same As) 2017-05-24 - Chapter No. 2017-28