FL S0720 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that advertisement of a sale or disposition of property may be in any commercially reasonable manner; specifying when advertising may be considered to have been conducted in a commercially reasonable manner; providing that a self-storage facility owner is not required to have a license to post property for online sale; deleting a required alternative form of advertisement; providing options for the disposition of motor vehicles or watercraft claimed to be subject to a lien, etc.
Title
Self-storage Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2015-11-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/01/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Regulated Industries; Fiscal Policy |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0559 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations Committee