FL S0720 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the drilling or exploration for, or production of, oil, gas, or other petroleum products on the lands and waters of the state; prohibiting the permitting and construction of certain structures intended to drill or explore for, or produce or transport, oil, gas, or other petroleum products; requiring that all electricity used in this state be generated by renewable energy by a specified date; requiring statewide net zero carbon emissions by a specified date; creating the Renewable Energy Workforce Development Advisory Renewable Energy Workforce Development Advisory Committee in the Office of Energy within the department, etc.
Title
State Renewable Energy Goals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H283 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
H333 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S722 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
H333 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S722 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
366 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 242 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 821 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
377 | 8225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/720 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/720/BillText/Filed/HTML |