FL S0720 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "continuous service" for purposes of the Florida Retirement System; revising an exception to the employment after retirement limitations for retired law enforcement officers who are reemployed with a covered employer, etc.
Title
Florida Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/720 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/720/BillText/Filed/HTML |