FL S0728 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2019-164)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2019-164)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing sufficiently contiguous lands located within the county or municipality which a petitioner anticipates adding to the boundaries of a new community development district to also be identified in a petition to establish the new district under certain circumstances; providing requirements for the petition; providing notification requirements for the petition, etc.
Title
Community Development Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2019-164) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 437 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-04 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H437 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-164