FL S0728 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Decreasing the criminal penalty for threatening to throw, project, place, or discharge any destructive device with intent to do bodily harm to any person or with intent to do damage to any property of any person; prohibiting threats to use a firearm or weapon with specified intent; providing criminal penalties; redefining the term "violence" to include incidents of cyberstalking, etc.
Title
Threats
Sponsors
Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Senate Infrastructure and Security Committee | Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-10 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-06 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-06 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (161760) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS/CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H311 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
784 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |