FL S0728 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Education Pre-K -12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing district school boards to use advanced degrees in setting salary schedules for instructional personnel, etc.
Title
K-12 Instructional Personnel Salary Schedules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K -12 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Rules |
2023-12-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7000 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Messages
H7039 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002
S7002 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-159, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2024-101), CS/CS/SB 994 (Ch. 2024-190)
H7039 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 7002
S7002 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Chapter No. 2024-159, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2024-101), CS/CS/SB 994 (Ch. 2024-190)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/728 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/728/BillText/Filed/HTML |