FL S0736 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 747
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 747
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring health insurers and health maintenance organizations, respectively, to provide reasonable reimbursement to air ambulance services for certain covered services; providing that such reimbursement may be reduced only by certain amounts; providing that full payment of an applicable copayment, coinsurance, or deductible constitutes an accord, satisfaction, and release of certain claims, etc.
Title
Coverage for Air Ambulance Services
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Senate Banking and Insurance Committee | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 747 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 747 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/21/20, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H747 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-177
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 42397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |