FL S0750 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides definitions. Requires certain health benefit plans to authorize licensed pharmacists and permitted pharmacies to serve as participating pharmacy services providers for any of the plan's participants under certain circumstances.
Title
Health Benefit Plans
Sponsors
Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 60 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 60 | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0527 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/750 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0750/BillText/Filed/HTML |