FL S0750 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Articulation Coordinating Committee to convene a workgroup by a specified date to develop specified articulation agreements; requiring Florida College System institutions to award transfer credit for certain courses; providing requirements for an associate in arts specialized transfer degree; providing that, upon approval of a new associate in arts specialized transfer degree, Florida College System institutions may offer the degree and shall report certain data, etc.
Title
Articulation Agreements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Postsecondary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Education |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education Postsecondary; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1401 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |