FL S0752 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to create a Play Ball license plate; establishing an annual use fee for the plate; providing for the distribution of the use fees received from the sale of such plates, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Rules; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0867 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee
S0244 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
S0244 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Transportation, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/752 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/0752/BillText/Filed/HTML |