FL S0770 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits until July 1, 2020, the governing board of a water management district or the Department of Environmental Protection from approving an application for a required permit if the applicant intends to resell the water for a commercial profit.
Title
Permits/Consumptive Use of Water/Commercial Profit [EPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Environmental Preservation and Conservation | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Commerce; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00056 | |
2009-12-17 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Commerce; General Government Appropriations | |
2009-11-18 | Filed |