FL S0774 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Adding company employee adjusters to the list of persons who may respond to a claimant's written request for information relating to liability insurance coverage; requiring a company employee adjuster who provides a specified statement to consult with certain personnel within the company to verify information disclosed in the statement, etc.
Title
Liability Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2016-01-20 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/19/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2015-11-19 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0577 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulatory Affairs Committee