FL S0798 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Cites this act as the "Florida's One-Stop Business Connect Act." Requires the Governor to establish the One-Stop Business Workgroup. Requires that the workgroup submit a plan for establishing a business licensing portal to the Governor and Legislature by a specified date. Provides requirements for the plan to implement a technology solution that provides businesses and individuals with easy access to state and local requirements for business licenses, certifications, and registrations, etc.
Title
Issuance of Licenses/Certifications/Registrations
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 235 | |
2011-03-17 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Commerce and Tourism (546494); YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 235 | |
2011-03-11 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/16/11, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 62 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 62 | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0187 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/798 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0798/BillText/Filed/HTML |