FL S0798 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposing an excise tax upon bottled water operators; requiring that tax proceeds be separately accounted for and be used for certain purposes; specifying requirements for bottled water operators in filing monthly returns with the Department of Revenue; specifying the penalty for the substantial underpayment of taxes; requiring governmental entities to cooperate with the department and furnish information without cost to the department for certain purposes; requiring that suits brought by the department for violations be brought in circuit court, etc.
Title
Bottled Water Excise Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Environment and Natural Resources |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H473 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Ways & Means Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
211 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/798 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/798/BillText/Filed/HTML |