FL S0804 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a person to donate his or her electronic health records, subject to certain requirements; authorizing electronic health records and qualified electronic health records to be donated to specified entities for specified purposes; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration and the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to develop and implement a program that encourages and authorizes persons to donate electronic health records and qualified electronic health records as part of a process of issuing and renewing identification cards and driver licenses, etc.
Title
Electronic Health Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/18/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/28/17, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Transportation |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/14/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1371 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 1141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |