FL S0820 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption for public and private preschools from specified special assessments levied by a municipality; defining the term "preschool"; authorizing the use of credits against certain taxes beginning on a specified date; providing a limitation on such credits; requiring repayment of tax credits under certain conditions and using a specified formula; revising licensing standards for all licensed child care facilities and minimum standards and training requirements for child care personnel, etc.
Title
Child Care and Early Learning Providers
Sponsors
Senate Finance and Tax Committee | Senate Education Pre-K -12 Committee | Sen. Erin Grall [R] | Sen. Rosalind Osgood [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Finance and Tax (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-24 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-17 | Senate | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H635 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S596 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1026 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
H1353 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)
S596 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1026 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
H1353 (Similar To) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
S7074 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7073
H7073 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Chapter No. 2024-158; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 328 (Ch. 2024-188)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
170 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
211 | 0254 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
212 | 1835 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 3115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 1214 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 509 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 5107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 70161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |