FL S0822 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the penalties for persons operating a vessel involved in an accident or injury who leave the scene of the accident or injury under certain circumstances; providing a mandatory minimum sentence for a person who willfully commits such a violation resulting in the death of another while boating under the influence; defining the term "serious bodily injury"; revising the definition of the term "vessel homicide" to include the killing of an unborn child by causing injury to the mother by operation of a vessel in a reckless manner under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Vessel Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 70 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/822 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/822/BillText/Filed/HTML |