FL S0828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-50, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-50, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain lewd or lascivious acts in the presence of county correctional personnel; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Lewd or Lascivious Exhibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#297 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Chapter No. 2019-50, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) | |
2019-05-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-05-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H599 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)