FL S0836 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the annual allocation to school districts to include an additional calculation of full-time equivalent membership for students who earn a College Board Advanced Placement Capstone Diploma, etc.
Title
Funds for the Operation of Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 641 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted HB 641 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 01/28/20, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-11-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H641 (Same As) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/836 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/836/BillText/Filed/HTML |